Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 12 Online
» 752 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14158 Week
» 67174 Month
» 186701 Year
» 3213554 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D4144 |
31/08/1962 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
08914 |
02/1974 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
by 12/1975 |
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
31/08/1962 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
31/08/1962 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D4144 Built at Horwich Works Allocated to Nuneaton (2B) |
|
|
18/01/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Rugby (1F) |
|
|
14/09/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Longsight (9A) |
|
|
02/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 08914 |
|
|
12/1975 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
30/06/2005 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 08914 |
|
|
08/2005 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Ron Hull Jr.: Rotherham |
|
|