Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 16 Online
» 598 Today
» 1004 Yesterday
» 6203 Week
» 17750 Month
» 417432 Year
» 494019 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GWR 4144   10/09/1946

Locomotive Specifics
Designer Collett
Class 5101
Company History GWR
Wheels 2-6-2T
Builder Swindon Works
To Service Mon 10/09/1946
Withdrawal During 06/1965
Service Life 18 yrs, 8 mths , 21 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
86F Tondu 4w/e 07/09/1957
86E Severn Tunnel Junction 4w/e 15/12/1962
   Withdrawn m/e 06/1965

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
1STALLOC TDU Tondu m/e 31/10/1946
ALLOC STJ Severn Tunnel Junction 4w/e 22/03/1947
ALLOC 86F Tondu 4w/e 07/09/1957
ALLOC 86E Severn Tunnel Junction 4w/e 15/12/1962
WDN   4w/e 13/06/1965

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
09/1946 To Service To service as GWR Number 4144
Built at Swindon Works
   
07/09/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Tondu (86F)    
15/12/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Severn Tunnel Junction (86E)    
06/1965 Withdrawn Condemned as 4144    

prev prev