Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 5 Online
» 127 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 17930 Week
» 70946 Month
» 190473 Year
» 3217326 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Western Railway |
4145 |
on |
17/09/1946 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
C. Collett |
Class |
5101 |
Company History |
GWR |
Wheels |
2-6-2T |
Builder |
Swindon Works |
Order Number |
335 |
To Service |
Tue 17/09/1946 |
Withdrawal |
Tue 18/12/1962 |
Service Life |
16 yrs, 3 mths , 1 dy |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
17/09/1946 |
To Service |
To service as Great Western Railway Number 4145 Built at Swindon Works |
|
|
15/06/1947 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Ebbw Junction (Newport) (NPT ) |
|
|
30/10/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cardiff Canton (CDF) |
|
|
01/12/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Ebbw Junction (Newport) (86A) |
|
|
31/12/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Ebbw Junction (Newport) (86A) |
|
|
25/11/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Severn Tunnel Junction (86E) |
|
|
14/08/1954 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Newton Abbot (83A) |
|
|
21/05/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Exeter (83C) |
|
|
05/11/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Severn Tunnel Junction (86E) |
|
|
18/12/1962 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 4145 |
|
|
02/1963 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Cashmore's: Newport |
|
|