Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 13 Online
» 200 Today
» 866 Yesterday
» 1945 Week
» 10687 Month
» 354866 Year
» 865968 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D415 02/04/1968
TOPS (Tops) 50015 01/01/1973

Names Carried
Name Date From
Valiant 21/04/1978

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 50
Wheels Co-Co
Builder English Electric Vulcan Foundry
To Service 02/04/1968
Withdrawn 05/06/1992
Withdrawal Reason Surplus to requirements
Time in Service 24 yrs, 2 mths , 3 dys
Cut Up 30/03/1993
Status Preserved

Allocations
Code Name Date From
WL Western Lines (LMR) (New) 02/04/1968
D05 Stoke Division 17/06/1968
LA Laira w/e 11/05/1974
   Withdrawn 05/06/1992

Preservation
Current Status Unknown


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
02/04/1968 To Service To service as D415
Built at English Electric Vulcan Foundry
Allocated to Western Lines (LMR) (WL)
   
11/04/1968 Sightings Failed between Carlisle and Braidwood on the up "Mid Day Scot" RCTS 6/1968  
13/04/1968 Sightings Polmadie depot: Stabled on Polmadie depot RCTS 6/1968 Link
17/06/1968 Allocation Reallocated to Stoke Division (D05)    
27/12/1971 Sightings Stabled at Crewe Diesel depot: Stabled on Crewe Diesel depot RO 517 Link
01/01/1973 Renumbered Renumbered to 50015    
11/05/1974 Allocation Reallocated to Laira (LA)    
21/04/1978 Naming Named 'Valiant' at Laira    
05/06/1992 Withdrawn Condemned as 50015    

prev prev