Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 21 Online
» 775 Today
» 1004 Yesterday
» 6380 Week
» 17927 Month
» 417609 Year
» 494196 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GWR 4150   05/06/1947

Locomotive Specifics
Designer Collett
Class 5101
Company History GWR
Wheels 2-6-2T
Builder Swindon Works
To Service Mon 05/06/1947
Withdrawal During 06/1965
Service Life 17 yrs, 11 mths , 26 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
82A Bristol Bath Road 4w/e 16/05/1953
82F Weymouth Radipole (GWR) 8w/e 11/07/1953
83B Taunton 4w/e 08/10/1955
83A Newton Abbot 4w/e 03/11/1956
83C Exeter 4w/e 21/05/1960
83A Newton Abbot 4w/e 15/07/1961
82D Westbury 4w/e 14/07/1962
86E Severn Tunnel Junction 4w/e 11/08/1962
   Withdrawn m/e 06/1965

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
NEW STB Stourbridge Junction m/e 30/06/1947
ALLOC 82A Bristol Bath Road 4w/e 16/05/1953
ALLOC 82F Weymouth Radipole (GWR) 4w/e 11/07/1953
ALLOC 83B Taunton 4w/e 08/10/1955
ALLOC 83A Newton Abbot 4w/e 03/11/1956
ALLOC 83C Exeter 4w/e 21/05/1960
ALLOC 83A Newton Abbot 4w/e 15/07/1961
ALLOC 82D Westbury 4w/e 14/07/1962
ALLOC 86E Severn Tunnel Junction 4w/e 11/08/1962
TOSTORE   4w/e 13/06/1965

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
06/1947 To Service To service as GWR Number 4150
Built at Swindon Works
   
16/05/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (82A)    
11/07/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Weymouth Radipole (GWR) (82F)    
08/10/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Taunton (83B)    
03/11/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Newton Abbot (83A)    
21/05/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Exeter (83C)    
15/07/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Newton Abbot (83A)    
14/07/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Westbury (82D)    
11/08/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Severn Tunnel Junction (86E)    
06/1965 Withdrawn Condemned as 4150    

prev prev