Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 15 Online
» 4 Today
» 1226 Yesterday
» 1230 Week
» 20875 Month
» 55517 Year
» 1277082 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GWR 4151   12/06/1947

Locomotive Specifics
Designer C. Collett
Class 5101
Company History GWR
Wheels 2-6-2T
Builder Swindon Works
To Service Wed 12/06/1947
Withdrawal During 04/1965
Scrapping During 09/1965
Service Life 17 yrs, 9 mths , 19 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
86E Severn Tunnel Junction 3w/e 19/05/1951
86A Ebbw Junction (Newport) 4w/e 14/07/1962
86E Severn Tunnel Junction 4w/e 08/09/1962
84D Leamington w/e 22/06/1963
2C Stourbridge Junction w/e 13/03/1965
   Withdrawn m/e 04/1965

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
NEW BRD Bristol Bath Road m/e 30/06/1947
ALLOC 86E Severn Tunnel Junction 4w/e 19/05/1951
ALLOC 86A Ebbw Junction (Newport) 4w/e 14/07/1962
ALLOC 86E Severn Tunnel Junction 4w/e 08/09/1962
ALLOC 84D Leamington 4w/e 29/06/1963
ALLOC 84D Leamington 5w/e 06/07/1963
ALLOC 2C Stourbridge Junction 5w/e 13/03/1965
ALLOC 2C Stourbridge Junction 5w/e 12/04/1965
WDN   w/e 17/04/1965
WDN   5w/e 16/05/1965

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
06/1947 To Service To service as GWR Number 4151
Built at Swindon Works
   
19/05/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Severn Tunnel Junction (86E)    
14/07/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Ebbw Junction (Newport) (86A)    
08/09/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Severn Tunnel Junction (86E)    
22/06/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Leamington (84D)    
13/03/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Stourbridge Junction (2C)    
04/1965 Withdrawn Condemned as 4151    

prev prev