Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 1 Online
» 305 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18108 Week
» 71124 Month
» 190651 Year
» 3217504 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D4152 |
02/11/1962 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
08922 |
05/1974 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front with black chevrons |
by 10/1970 |
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
02/11/1962 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
02/11/1962 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D4152 Built at Horwich Works Allocated to Speke Junction (8C) |
|
|
11/05/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Allerton (8J) |
|
|
27/06/1970 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Barrow in Furness (12C) |
|
|
10/1970 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front with black chevrons |
|
|
05/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 08922 |
|
|
11/10/1975 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Allerton (AN) |
|
|