Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 19 Online
» 4670 Today
» 4868 Yesterday
» 23581 Week
» 88535 Month
» 291199 Year
» 3318052 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D4156 |
21/12/1962 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
08926 |
05/1974 |
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
21/12/1962 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
21/12/1962 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D4156 Built at Horwich Works Allocated to Lancaster Green Ayre (24J) |
|
|
03/08/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Carnforth (24L) |
|
|
14/01/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Carlisle Kingmoor (12A) |
|
|
05/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 08926 |
|
|
03/08/1974 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Barrow in Furness (BW) |
|
|
11/10/1975 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Willesden (WN) |
|
|
28/02/2007 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 08926 |
|
|
13/08/2007 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by EMR: Kingsbury |
|
|