Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 17 Online
» 2967 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 16373 Week
» 69389 Month
» 188916 Year
» 3215769 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D4159 |
16/04/1962 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
08929 |
12/1973 |
|
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
12/1973 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
16/04/1962 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
12/1973 |
x |
Dual brakes |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
16/04/1962 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D4159 Built at Darlington Works Allocated to Laira (83D) |
|
|
23/06/1973 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (BR) |
|
|
19/07/1973 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Eastleigh (EH) |
|
|
12/1973 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
12/1973 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 08929 |
|
|
29/05/1988 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Ashford Chart Leacon (AF) |
|
|
09/12/1991 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 08929 from Old Oak Common (OC) |
|
|
03/02/1994 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Gwent Demolition: Margam |
|
|