Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 13 Online
» 227 Today
» 1225 Yesterday
» 227 Week
» 11774 Month
» 411456 Year
» 488043 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D4163 05/05/1962
TOPS (Tops) 08933 02/1974

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 08
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Darlington Works
To Service 05/05/1962
Withdrawn 30/09/2008
Time in Service 46 yrs, 4 mths , 25 dys
Status Preserved

Allocations
Code Name Date From
83B Taunton (New) 05/05/1962
83C Westbury 4w/e 11/07/1965
82A Bristol Bath Road 7w/e 27/07/1968
82C Swindon 4w/e 24/01/1970
EH Eastleigh w/e 08/12/1973
   Withdrawn 30/09/2008

Preservation
Current Status Unknown


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
25/03/1962 Sightings Darlington Works visit: Around the works - Erecting shop - frames. SLS 5/1962 Link
05/05/1962 To Service To service as D4163
Built at Darlington Works
Allocated to Taunton (83B)
   
11/07/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Westbury (83C)    
27/07/1968 Allocation Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (82A)    
24/01/1970 Allocation Reallocated to Swindon (82C)    
09/01/1972 Sightings Swindon Works visit: Stabling Point RO 3/1972 Link
08/12/1973 Allocation Reallocated to Eastleigh (EH)    
02/1974 Renumbered Renumbered to 08933    
08/1974 Modification Modification: Air Brakes fitted    
30/09/2008 Withdrawn Condemned as 08933    

prev prev