Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 12 Online
» 542 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18345 Week
» 71361 Month
» 190888 Year
» 3217741 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D4166 |
17/05/1962 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
08936 |
02/1974 |
|
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
11/1969 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
06/12/1969 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
17/05/1962 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
11/1969 |
x |
Dual brakes |
|
|
|
06/12/1969 |
x |
Dual brakes |
|
|
|
Preservation
Current Status |
Unknown |
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
17/05/1962 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D4166 Built at Darlington Works Allocated to St Blazey (83E) |
|
|
27/07/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (82A) |
|
|
11/1969 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
06/12/1969 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
06/12/1969 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Old Oak Common (81A) |
|
|
02/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 08936 |
|
|
14/06/1975 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (BR) |
|
|
12/1976 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Old Oak Common (OC) |
|
|
04/10/1987 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (NC) |
|
|
11/12/1992 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 08936 from March (MR) |
|
|