Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 16 Online
» 807 Today
» 986 Yesterday
» 2715 Week
» 18913 Month
» 183813 Year
» 694915 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D417 06/04/1968
TOPS (Tops) 50017 01/01/1973

Names Carried
Name Date From
Royal Oak 24/04/1978

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 50
Wheels Co-Co
Builder English Electric Vulcan Foundry
To Service 06/04/1968
Withdrawn 01/09/1991
Withdrawal Reason Main generator
Time in Service 23 yrs, 4 mths , 26 dys
Status Preserved

Allocations
Code Name Date From
WL Western Lines (LMR) (New) 06/04/1968
D05 Stoke Division 17/06/1968
BR Bristol Bath Road w/e 11/05/1974
CD Crewe Diesel w/e 25/05/1974
LA Laira w/e 10/01/1976
   Withdrawn 01/09/1991

Preservation
Current Status Unknown


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
06/04/1968 To Service To service as D417
Built at English Electric Vulcan Foundry
Allocated to Western Lines (LMR) (WL)
   
17/06/1968 Allocation Reallocated to Stoke Division (D05)    
01/01/1973 Renumbered Renumbered to 50017    
11/05/1974 Allocation Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (BR)    
25/05/1974 Allocation Reallocated to Crewe Diesel (CD)    
10/01/1976 Allocation Reallocated to Laira (LA)    
24/04/1978 Naming Named 'Royal Oak' at Laira    
01/09/1991 Withdrawn Condemned as 50017    

prev prev