Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 5 Online
» 133 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 17936 Week
» 70952 Month
» 190479 Year
» 3217332 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D4176 |
22/08/1962 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
08946 |
02/1974 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front with black chevrons |
by 10/1970 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
10/1970 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
10/10/1970 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
22/08/1962 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
10/1970 |
x |
Dual brakes |
|
|
|
10/10/1970 |
x |
Dual brakes |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
22/08/1962 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D4176 Built at Darlington Works Allocated to Ebbw Junction (Newport) (86A) |
|
|
10/1970 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front with black chevrons |
|
|
10/1970 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
10/10/1970 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
14/11/1970 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cardiff Canton (86A) |
|
|
11/08/1973 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Oxford (OX) |
|
|
17/11/1973 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Reading (W.R.) (RG) |
|
|
02/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 08946 |
|
|
28/02/2007 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 08946 |
|
|
05/2008 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Goodman's: Sutton Coldfield |
|
|