Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 16 Online
» 3777 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 17183 Week
» 70199 Month
» 189726 Year
» 3216579 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D418 |
11/04/1968 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
50018 |
23/03/1974 |
|
Names Carried
Name |
Date From |
Resolution |
06/04/1978 |
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
by 04/1978 |
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
11/04/1968 |
xes |
Dual brakes, Electric Train Heating, Slow Speed Control |
BR AWS |
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
11/04/1968 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D418 Built at English Electric Vulcan Foundry Allocated to Western Lines (LMR) (WL) |
|
|
17/06/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stoke Division (D05) |
|
|
23/03/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 50018 |
|
|
11/05/1974 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (BR) |
|
|
08/05/1976 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Laira (LA) |
|
|
04/1978 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
06/04/1978 |
Naming |
Named 'Resolution' at Laira |
|
|
22/07/1991 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 50018 |
|
|
14/07/1992 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by MC Metals: Springburn |
|
|