Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 11 Online
» 256 Today
» 4689 Yesterday
» 15868 Week
» 114513 Month
» 317177 Year
» 3344030 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D4180 |
12/09/1962 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
08950 |
02/1974 |
|
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
10/1970 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
07/11/1970 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
12/09/1962 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
10/1970 |
x |
Dual brakes |
|
|
|
07/11/1970 |
x |
Dual brakes |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
12/09/1962 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D4180 Built at Darlington Works Allocated to Ebbw Junction (Newport) (86A) |
|
|
10/1970 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
07/11/1970 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
14/11/1970 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Landore (87A) |
|
|
12/08/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cardiff Canton (86A) |
|
|
30/09/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Old Oak Common (81A) |
|
|
02/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 08950 |
|
|
08/1977 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Worcester (WS) |
|
|