Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 19 Online
» 3085 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 16491 Week
» 69507 Month
» 189034 Year
» 3215887 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D4181 |
20/09/1962 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
08951 |
02/1974 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front with black chevrons |
by 03/1971 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
09/01/1971 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
20/09/1962 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
09/01/1971 |
x |
Dual brakes |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
20/09/1962 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D4181 Built at Darlington Works Allocated to Ebbw Junction (Newport) (86A) |
|
|
09/01/1971 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
27/02/1971 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Penzance (84D) |
|
|
03/1971 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front with black chevrons |
|
|
02/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 08951 |
|
|
11/05/1974 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (BR) |
|
|
08/1977 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Worcester (WS) |
|
|