Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 14 Online
» 1049 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18852 Week
» 71868 Month
» 191395 Year
» 3218248 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D4184 |
23/10/1962 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
08954 |
02/1974 |
|
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
08/05/1971 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
23/10/1962 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
08/05/1971 |
x |
Dual brakes |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
23/10/1962 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D4184 Built at Darlington Works Allocated to Ebbw Junction (Newport) (86A) |
|
|
08/05/1971 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
22/05/1971 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Laira (84A) |
|
|
02/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 08954 |
|
|
11/05/1974 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Penzance (PZ) |
|
|
01/05/1976 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Laira (LA) |
|
|