Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 24 Online
» 4214 Today
» 4916 Yesterday
» 13788 Week
» 78742 Month
» 281406 Year
» 3308259 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D4189 |
31/07/1962 |
|
Pre TOPS (Class 13) |
D4501 |
26/06/1965 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
13001 |
1973 |
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
31/07/1962 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
31/07/1962 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D4189 Built at Darlington Works Allocated to Stratford (30A) |
|
|
13/06/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Parkeston Quay (30F) |
|
|
30/01/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (41A) |
|
|
26/06/1965 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 4501 |
|
|
1973 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 13001 |
|
|