Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 17 Online
» 534 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18337 Week
» 71353 Month
» 190880 Year
» 3217733 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D421 |
01/05/1968 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
50021 |
23/11/1973 |
|
Names Carried
Name |
Date From |
Rodney |
31/07/1978 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
02/1970 |
|
Multiple Working Fitted |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
01/05/1968 |
xes |
Dual brakes, Electric Train Heating, Slow Speed Control |
BR AWS |
|
|
02/1970 |
xes |
Dual brakes, Electric Train Heating, Slow Speed Control |
BR AWS, Multiple Working fitted |
|
|
Preservation
Current Status |
Unknown |
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
01/05/1968 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D421 Built at English Electric Vulcan Foundry Allocated to Western Lines (LMR) (WL) |
|
|
17/06/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stoke Division (D05) |
|
|
02/1970 |
Modification |
Modification: Multiple Working Fitted |
|
|
23/11/1973 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 50021 |
|
|
10/05/1975 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to To Western Region / GWR (91W) |
|
|
31/07/1978 |
Naming |
Named 'Rodney' at Laira |
|
|
05/06/1988 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Laira (LA) |
|
|
17/04/1990 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 50021 |
|
|
19/10/1992 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|