Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 22 Online
» 1432 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14838 Week
» 67854 Month
» 187381 Year
» 3214234 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Western Railway |
4212 |
m/e |
08/1912 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
G. Churchward |
Class |
42xx |
Company History |
GWR |
Wheels |
2-8-0T |
Builder |
Swindon Works |
Order Number |
187 |
Works Number |
2456 |
To Service |
During 08/1912 |
Withdrawal |
Mon 15/06/1959 |
Service Life |
46 yrs, 10 mths , 15 dys |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
DYD |
Duffryn Yard |
m/e |
30/04/1948 |
ALLOC |
84G |
Shrewsbury |
4w/e |
21/03/1959 |
WDN |
|
|
m/e |
30/06/1959 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
08/1912 |
To Service |
To service as Great Western Railway Number 4212 Built at Swindon Works, Works Number 2456 |
|
|
11/01/1936 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Landore (LDR) |
|
|
15/06/1947 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Landore (LDR) |
|
|
30/04/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Duffryn Yard (DYD) |
|
|
21/03/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Shrewsbury (84G) |
|
|
15/06/1959 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 4212 |
|
|
28/02/1960 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Cashmore's: Newport |
|
|