Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 7 Online
» 232 Today
» 1267 Yesterday
» 232 Week
» 34807 Month
» 104286 Year
» 1325851 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GWR 4220 m/e 12/1912
GWR (Rblds) 7241 m/e 12/1912

Locomotive Specifics
Designer G. Churchward
Class 42xx
Company History GWR
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
420012/1912
720009/1937
Wheels 2-8-0T
Builder Swindon Works
To Service During 12/1912
Withdrawal Mon 26/11/1962
Scrapping During 12/1962
Service Life 49 yrs, 11 mths , 27 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
82B St Philips Marsh 4w/e 24/04/1954
87B Duffryn Yard 4w/e 23/04/1955
88C Barry 4w/e 28/01/1956
   Withdrawn 26/11/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 82B St Philips Marsh 4w/e 24/04/1954
ALLOC 87B Duffryn Yard 4w/e 23/04/1955
ALLOC 88C Barry 4w/e 28/01/1956
WDN   26/11/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also

prev prev