Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 19 Online
» 273 Today
» 1267 Yesterday
» 273 Week
» 34848 Month
» 104327 Year
» 1325892 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GWR 4224 m/e 11/1913

Locomotive Specifics
Designer G. Churchward
Class 42xx
Company History GWR
Wheels 2-8-0T
Builder Swindon Works
To Service During 11/1913
Withdrawal During 02/1959
Scrapping During 04/1959
Service Life 45 yrs , 3 mths

Allocations
Code Name From Date
88C Barry 4w/e 05/09/1953
88A Cardiff Cathays 4w/e 23/04/1955
86F Tondu 4w/e 05/11/1955
   Withdrawn m/e 02/1959

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 86C Cardiff Canton 4w/e 25/03/1950
ALLOC 88C Barry 4w/e 05/09/1953
ALLOC 88A Cardiff Cathays 4w/e 23/04/1955
ALLOC 86F Tondu m/e 30/11/1955
WDN   m/e 28/02/1959

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also

prev prev