Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 12 Online
» 4252 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 17658 Week
» 70674 Month
» 190201 Year
» 3217054 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Western Railway |
4226 |
m/e |
11/1913 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
G. Churchward |
Class |
42xx |
Company History |
GWR |
Wheels |
2-8-0T |
Builder |
Swindon Works |
Order Number |
196 |
Works Number |
2545 |
To Service |
During 11/1913 |
Withdrawal |
Mon 09/03/1959 |
Service Life |
45 yrs, 4 mths , 6 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 11/1959 |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
86C |
Cardiff Canton |
4w/e |
13/06/1953 |
WDN |
|
|
m/e |
31/03/1959 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
31/05/1959 |
Swindon Works (Scrapyard) |
Scrapyard1401/23/9/37/56/7/57, 2254, 2812/23/5/30/3, 4200/26/61, 4377, 4540/53/84, 5315/55/82/6/8/90, 5566, 5703/8/33/43, 5810, 6318/22/8/31/4/54, 6409/28, 6721/3/7/43, 7738. |
SLS/195907 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
11/1913 |
To Service |
To service as Great Western Railway Number 4226 Built at Swindon Works, Works Number 2545 |
|
|
14/12/1935 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Aberbeeg (ABEEG) |
|
|
15/06/1947 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Newport Pill (PILL) |
|
|
16/05/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cardiff Canton (86C) |
|
|
09/03/1959 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 4226 |
|
|
11/1959 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|