Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 19 Online
» 4061 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 17467 Week
» 70483 Month
» 190010 Year
» 3216863 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D423 |
08/05/1968 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
50023 |
18/12/1973 |
|
Names Carried
Name |
Date From |
Howe |
17/05/1978 |
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
08/05/1968 |
xes |
Dual brakes, Electric Train Heating, Slow Speed Control |
BR AWS |
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
08/05/1968 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D423 Built at English Electric Vulcan Foundry Allocated to Western Lines (LMR) (WL) |
|
|
17/06/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stoke Division (D05) |
|
|
18/12/1973 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 50023 |
|
|
11/05/1974 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (BR) |
|
|
08/05/1976 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Laira (LA) |
|
|
17/05/1978 |
Naming |
Named 'Howe' at Laira |
|
|
15/10/1990 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 50023 |
|
|
30/04/2003 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Harry Needle Railroad Company: at Barrow Hill |
|
|