Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 13 Online
» 4288 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 17694 Week
» 70710 Month
» 190237 Year
» 3217090 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London and North Western Railway |
910 |
m/e |
09/1890 |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
6601 |
m/e |
11/1927 |
British Railways |
46601 |
m/e |
09/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
F. Webb |
Class |
1P |
Company History |
LNWR/LMS |
Wheels |
2-4-2T |
Builder |
Crewe Works |
Order Number |
No Order ID issued |
Works Number |
3152 |
To Service |
During 09/1890 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 05/12/1953 |
Service Life |
63 yrs, 3 mths , 4 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During y/e 1954 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
31/07/1947 |
Market Harborough Station |
Recent unusual visitors have included L.N.E.R. 'B16/3' 1421 YK on 24/6 and 'K3' 1899 on 8/7, both at the head of specials carrying European Volunteer Workers. Although the line from Nottingham via Melton Mowbray is G.N. and L.N.W. Joint, the L.M.S. normally works all traffic South of John O'Gaunt. The locomotives were turned on the L.N.W. turntable and returned North with the empty stock. On 8/7 the 8.3 a.m. arrival from Rugby was worked by L.M.S. 28450 . This local passenger working is more usually in the hands of one of the Harborough 4F's or L.N.W. 0-8-0's. With the departure of 6601 , the 6.25 a.m. to Rugby and the 5.40 p.m. ex Rugby are now worked by a variety of locomotives ranging from 2-6-2T to Stanier Class 5's. The latter train now runs, unadvertised, to East Norton for the benefit of local factory workers, returning as empty stock. |
SLS/194709 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
09/1890 |
To Service |
To service as London and North Western Railway Number 910 Built at Crewe Works, Works Number 3152 |
|
|
11/1927 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 6601 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Shrewsbury (4A) |
|
|
05/06/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) (4B) |
|
|
09/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 46601 |
|
|
23/10/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bletchley (2B) |
|
|
16/05/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Rugby (2A) |
|
|
11/07/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bletchley (1E) |
|
|
31/10/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Rugby (2A) |
|
|
05/12/1953 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 46601 |
|
|
1954 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|