Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 7 Online
» 226 Today
» 1253 Yesterday
» 7686 Week
» 5199 Month
» 233083 Year
» 1454648 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LNWR 1763 m/e 01/1892
LMS 6635 m/e 11/1926
BR 46635 m/e 03/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer F. Webb
Class 1P
Company History LNWR/LMS
Wheels 2-4-2T
Builder Crewe Works
Works Number 3236
To Service During 01/1892
Withdrawal Sat 01/04/1950
Scrapping During 04/1950
Service Life 58 yrs, 3 mths , 1 dy

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 01/1892
12G Dumfries 01/01/1948
   Withdrawn 01/04/1950

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 27C Hamilton (West) 4w/e 27/04/1946
ALLOC 12G Dumfries w/e 15/03/1947
WDN 68B Dumfries 01/04/1950

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
01/10/1949 Kilmarnock Works Locomotives entering Works 29/8 to 1/10: These included Nos. 594, 609, 40667, 939, 1139, 42422, 42808, 2911, 46635, 14503, 17230, 57319, 17457, 17563, 57614, 17627. SLS/194911

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
01/1892 To Service To service as London and North Western Railway Number 1763
Built at Crewe Works, Works Number 3236
   
11/1926 Renumbered Renumbered to 6635    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Dumfries (12G)    
03/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 46635    
01/04/1950 Withdrawn Condemned as 46635    

prev prev