Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 7 Online
» 297 Today
» 854 Yesterday
» 5266 Week
» 17779 Month
» 105971 Year
» 990352 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LNWR 431   12/1892
LMS 6643   08/1928
BR 46643   09/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer Webb
Class 1P
Company History LNWR/LMS
Wheels 2-4-2T
Builder Crewe Works
Works Number 3255
To Service During 12/1892
Withdrawal During 01/1953
Scrapping During y/e 1953
Service Life 60 yrs, 1 mth , 1 dy

Allocations
Code Name From Date
7B Bangor 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
6D Chester Northgate 4w/e 27/01/1951
10E Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) 4w/e 19/05/1951
8B Warrington Dallam 4w/e 11/08/1951
6K Rhyl 4w/e 12/07/1952
   Withdrawn m/e 01/1953

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 5A Crewe North w/e 03/07/1948
ALLOC 7B Bangor w/e 07/08/1948
ALLOC 10E Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) w/e 30/10/1948
LOAN 6D Chester Northgate m/e 31/01/1951
EXLOAN 10E Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) w/e 31/03/1951
ALLOC 8B Warrington Dallam w/e 11/08/1951
ALLOC 6K Rhyl 4w/e 12/07/1952
WDN   w/e 14/02/1953

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
12/1892 To Service To service as LNWR Number 431
Built at Crewe Works, Works Number 3255
   
08/1928 Renumbered Renumbered to 6643    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Bangor (7B)    
09/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 46643    
27/01/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Chester Northgate (6D)    
19/05/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Sutton Oak (10E)    
11/08/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Warrington Dallam (8B)    
12/07/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Rhyl (6K)    
01/1953 Withdrawn Condemned as 46643    

prev prev