Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 5 Online
» 121 Today
» 908 Yesterday
» 1029 Week
» 22011 Month
» 163965 Year
» 1048346 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LNWR 2132 m/e 09/1893
LMS 6656 m/e 03/1927
BR 46656 m/e 01/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer F. Webb
Class 1P
Company History LNWR/LMS
Wheels 2-4-2T
Builder Crewe Works
Works Number 3402
To Service During 09/1893
Withdrawal During 02/1952
Scrapping During 04/1952
Service Life 58 yrs , 5 mths

Allocations
Code Name From Date
27C Hamilton (West) 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
12G Dumfries 3w/e 11/12/1948
68D Beattock 4w/e 16/07/1949
   Withdrawn m/e 02/1952

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
LOAN 27C Hamilton (West) 4w/e 27/04/1946
ALLOC 27A Polmadie w/e 31/01/1948
ALLOC 12G Dumfries w/e 27/11/1948
ALLOC 68D Beattock w/e 09/07/1949
WDN   01/03/1952

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
09/1893 To Service To service as LNWR Number 2132
Built at Crewe Works, Works Number 3402
   
03/1927 Renumbered Renumbered to 6656    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Hamilton (West) (27C)    
11/12/1948 Allocation Reallocated to Dumfries (12G)    
01/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 46656    
16/07/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Beattock (68D)    
02/1952 Withdrawn Condemned as 46656    

prev prev