Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 16 Online
» 584 Today
» 862 Yesterday
» 4132 Week
» 5022 Month
» 313003 Year
» 1197384 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LNWR 2134 m/e 09/1893
LMS 6658 m/e 05/1928
BR 46658 m/e 08/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer F. Webb
Class 1P
Company History LNWR/LMS
Wheels 2-4-2T
Builder Crewe Works
Works Number 3404
To Service During 09/1893
Withdrawal Sat 09/12/1950
Scrapping During y/e 1951
Service Life 57 yrs, 3 mths , 8 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
7D Rhyl 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
   Withdrawn 09/12/1950

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 2A Rugby w/e 21/06/1947
ALLOC 7D Rhyl w/e 23/08/1947
ALLOC 7A Llandudno Junction w/e 17/01/1948
LOAN 10E Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) w/e 05/11/1949
ALLOC 10E Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) w/e 10/12/1949
WDN   09/12/1950

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
09/1893 To Service To service as LNWR Number 2134
Built at Crewe Works, Works Number 3404
   
05/1928 Renumbered Renumbered to 6658    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Rhyl (7D)    
08/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 46658    
12/1950 Withdrawn Condemned as 46658    

prev prev