Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 5 Online
» 711 Today
» 862 Yesterday
» 4259 Week
» 5149 Month
» 313130 Year
» 1197511 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LNWR 2217 m/e 09/1893
LMS 6686 m/e 04/1928
BR 46686 m/e Not applied

Locomotive Specifics
Designer F. Webb
Class 1P
Company History LNWR/LMS
Wheels 2-4-2T
Builder Crewe Works
Works Number 3419
To Service During 09/1893
Withdrawal Sat 22/05/1948
Scrapping During 07/1948
Service Life 54 yrs, 8 mths , 21 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
1C Watford 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
   Withdrawn 22/05/1948

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
LOAN 1C Watford 5w/e 02/03/1946
ALLOC 1C Watford 4w/e 30/03/1946
WDN   w/e 22/05/1948

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
09/1893 To Service To service as LNWR Number 2217
Built at Crewe Works, Works Number 3419
   
04/1928 Renumbered Renumbered to 6686    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Watford (1C)    
22/05/1948 Withdrawn Condemned as 6686    
1949 Number Allocated Allocated number 46686 but not taken up    

prev prev