Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 18 Online
» 1079 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18882 Week
» 71898 Month
» 191425 Year
» 3218278 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London and North Western Railway |
626 |
m/e |
02/1895 |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
6710 |
m/e |
04/1926 |
British Railways |
46710 |
m/e |
Not applied |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
F. Webb |
Class |
1P |
Company History |
LNWR/LMS |
Wheels |
2-4-2T |
Builder |
Crewe Works |
Order Number |
No Order ID issued |
Works Number |
3495 |
To Service |
During 02/1895 |
Withdrawal |
During 09/1949 |
Service Life |
54 yrs , 7 mths |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During y/e 1949 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
02/1895 |
To Service |
To service as London and North Western Railway Number 626 Built at Crewe Works, Works Number 3495 |
|
|
04/1926 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 6710 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Warrington Dallam (8B) |
|
|
03/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Warrington Dallam (8B) |
|
|
05/06/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Crewe North (5A) |
|
|
11/12/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Crewe North (5A) |
|
|
1949 |
Number Allocated |
Allocated number 46710 but not taken up |
|
|
1949 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|
09/1949 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 6710 |
|
|