Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 9 Online
» 397 Today
» 854 Yesterday
» 5366 Week
» 17879 Month
» 106071 Year
» 990452 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LNWR 2260   04/1895
LMS 6727   11/1927
BR 46727   12/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer Webb
Class 1P
Company History LNWR/LMS
Wheels 2-4-2T
Builder Crewe Works
Works Number 3522
To Service During 04/1895
Withdrawal During 12/1952
Scrapping During 01/1953
Service Life 57 yrs, 7 mths , 30 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
7D Rhyl 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
8B Warrington Dallam 4w/e 31/12/1950
11B Barrow in Furness 4w/e 22/03/1952
   Withdrawn m/e 12/1952

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
LOAN 7D Rhyl m/e 31/01/1946
LOAN 7D Rhyl 5w/e 02/03/1946
ALLOC 10E Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) w/e 17/01/1948
ALLOC 4A Shrewsbury w/e 06/08/1949
LOAN 10D Plodder Lane w/e 12/11/1949
ALLOC 10E Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) w/e 26/11/1949
ALLOC 8B Warrington Dallam m/e 31/12/1950
LOAN 11B Barrow in Furness 4w/e 22/03/1952
ALLOC 11B Barrow in Furness 4w/e 19/04/1952
WDN   w/e 03/01/1953

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
04/1895 To Service To service as LNWR Number 2260
Built at Crewe Works, Works Number 3522
   
11/1927 Renumbered Renumbered to 6727    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Rhyl (7D)    
12/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 46727    
31/12/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Warrington Dallam (8B)    
22/03/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Barrow in Furness (11B)    
12/1952 Withdrawn Condemned as 46727    

prev prev