Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 18 Online
» 567 Today
» 852 Yesterday
» 6376 Week
» 13560 Month
» 321541 Year
» 1205922 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LNWR 1398 m/e 04/1897
LMS 6742 m/e 05/1927
BR 46742 m/e Not applied

Locomotive Specifics
Designer F. Webb
Class 1P
Company History LNWR/LMS
Wheels 2-4-2T
Builder Crewe Works
Works Number 3760
To Service During 04/1897
Withdrawal During 12/1949
Scrapping During y/e 1950
Service Life 52 yrs, 7 mths , 30 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
2C Northampton 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
   Withdrawn m/e 12/1949

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 2C Northampton w/e 03/01/1948
ALLOC 10E Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) w/e 06/11/1948
WDN   w/e 10/12/1949

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
04/1897 To Service To service as LNWR Number 1398
Built at Crewe Works, Works Number 3760
   
05/1927 Renumbered Renumbered to 6742    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Northampton (2C)    
1949 Number Allocated Allocated number 46742 but not taken up    
12/1949 Withdrawn Condemned as 6742    

prev prev