Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 16 Online
» 231 Today
» 839 Yesterday
» 231 Week
» 18552 Month
» 106744 Year
» 991125 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LNWR 1468   07/1897
LMS 6757   12/1927
BR 46757   05/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer Webb
Class 1P
Company History LNWR/LMS
Wheels 2-4-2T
Builder Crewe Works
Works Number 3776
To Service During 07/1897
Withdrawal During 02/1953
Scrapping During 03/1953
Service Life 55 yrs, 7 mths , 1 dy

Allocations
Code Name From Date
3C Ryecroft (Walsall) 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
10E Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) 4w/e 02/12/1950
2A Rugby 4w/e 23/02/1952
   Withdrawn m/e 02/1953

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 4A Shrewsbury 5w/e 02/03/1946
ALLOC 3C Ryecroft (Walsall) w/e 01/11/1947
ALLOC 10E Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) m/e 30/11/1950
ALLOC 2A Rugby 4w/e 23/02/1952
WDN   w/e 14/03/1953

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
07/1897 To Service To service as LNWR Number 1468
Built at Crewe Works, Works Number 3776
   
12/1927 Renumbered Renumbered to 6757    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Ryecroft (Walsall) (3C)    
05/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 46757    
02/12/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Sutton Oak (10E)    
23/02/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Rugby (2A)    
02/1953 Withdrawn Condemned as 46757    

prev