Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 26 Online
» 1337 Today
» 4868 Yesterday
» 20248 Week
» 85202 Month
» 287866 Year
» 3314719 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Lancashire and Yorkshire Railway |
1045 |
|
08/1890 |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway (1923) |
10642 |
|
by 1925 |
British Railways |
50642 |
|
15/05/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
J. Aspinall |
Class |
1008 |
Company History |
LYR/LMS |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
2-4-2T |
Builder |
Horwich Works |
Order Number |
4 |
Works Number |
43 |
To Service |
During 08/1890 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 24/03/1951 |
Service Life |
60 yrs, 7 mths , 21 dys |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
08/1890 |
26C |
|
Bolton |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
24F |
|
Fleetwood |
w/e |
03/09/1949 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
w/e |
24/03/1951 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
LOAN |
23B |
Aintree |
4w/e |
30/03/1946 |
ALLOC |
24F |
Fleetwood |
w/e |
03/09/1949 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
24/03/1951 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
08/1890 |
To Service |
To service as Lancashire and Yorkshire Railway Number 1045 Built at Horwich Works, Works Number 43 |
|
|
1925 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 10642 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Bolton (26C) |
|
|
15/05/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 50642 |
|
|
03/09/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Fleetwood (24F) |
|
|
24/03/1951 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 50642 |
|
|