Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 15 Online
» 1058 Today
» 1321 Yesterday
» 6961 Week
» 27924 Month
» 64677 Year
» 575779 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LYR 1052   09/1890
LMS (1923) 10647   by 1925
BR 50647   09/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer Aspinall
Class 1008
Company History LYR/LMS
Wheels 2-4-2T
Builder Horwich Works
Order Number 4
Works Number 50
To Service During 09/1890
Withdrawal During 02/1959
Service Life 68 yrs , 5 mths

Allocations
Code Name From Date
26C Bolton 4w/e 22/03/1952
26E Bacup 4w/e 04/10/1952
26D Bury 4w/e 06/11/1954
26C Bolton 4w/e 26/02/1955
   Withdrawn m/e 02/1959

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also

prev prev