Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 9 Online
» 455 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18258 Week
» 71274 Month
» 190801 Year
» 3217654 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Lancashire and Yorkshire Railway |
1172 |
|
08/1892 |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway (1923) |
10670 |
|
by 1925 |
British Railways |
50670 |
|
Not applied |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
J. Aspinall |
Class |
1008 |
Company History |
LYR/LMS |
Wheels |
2-4-2T |
Builder |
Horwich Works |
Order Number |
12 |
Works Number |
173 |
To Service |
During 08/1892 |
Withdrawal |
During 04/1949 |
Service Life |
56 yrs , 8 mths |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
08/1892 |
25D |
|
Mirfield |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
7D |
|
Rhyl |
w/e |
28/02/1948 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
m/e |
04/1949 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
23E |
Lostock Hall |
4w/e |
10/11/1945 |
ALLOC |
25D |
Mirfield |
4w/e |
08/12/1945 |
LOAN |
7D |
Rhyl |
w/e |
17/01/1948 |
ALLOC |
7D |
Rhyl |
w/e |
28/02/1948 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
09/04/1949 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
08/1892 |
To Service |
To service as Lancashire and Yorkshire Railway Number 1172 Built at Horwich Works, Works Number 173 |
|
|
1925 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 10670 |
|
|
1948 |
Number Allocated |
Allocated number 50670 but not taken up |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Mirfield (25D) |
|
|
28/02/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Rhyl (7D) |
|
|
04/1949 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 10670 |
|
|