Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 15 Online
» 2088 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19891 Week
» 72907 Month
» 192434 Year
» 3219287 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Lancashire and Yorkshire Railway |
16 |
|
09/1892 |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway (1923) |
10678 |
|
by 1925 |
British Railways |
50678 |
|
21/08/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
J. Aspinall |
Class |
1008 |
Company History |
LYR/LMS |
Wheels |
2-4-2T |
Builder |
Horwich Works |
Order Number |
12 |
Works Number |
181 |
To Service |
During 09/1892 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 26/12/1953 |
Service Life |
61 yrs, 3 mths , 25 dys |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
23C |
Southport |
w/e |
30/11/1946 |
LOAN |
7D |
Rhyl |
w/e |
17/01/1948 |
ALLOC |
7D |
Rhyl |
w/e |
28/02/1948 |
ALLOC |
10B |
Preston |
w/e |
21/10/1950 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
26/12/1953 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
09/1892 |
To Service |
To service as Lancashire and Yorkshire Railway Number 16 Built at Horwich Works, Works Number 181 |
|
|
1925 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 10678 |
|
|
08/02/1936 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Wigan Central (L&Y) (23D) |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Southport (23C) |
|
|
28/02/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Rhyl (7D) |
|
|
21/08/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 50678 |
|
|
21/10/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Preston (10B) |
|
|
04/11/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Preston (10B) |
|
|
26/12/1953 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 50678 |
|
|