Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 22 Online
» 2064 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19867 Week
» 72883 Month
» 192410 Year
» 3219263 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Lancashire and Yorkshire Railway |
1329 |
|
09/1896 |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway (1923) |
10762 |
|
by 1925 |
British Railways |
50762 |
|
12/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
J. Aspinall |
Class |
1008 |
Company History |
LYR/LMS |
Wheels |
2-4-2T |
Builder |
Horwich Works |
Order Number |
28 |
Works Number |
469 |
To Service |
During 09/1896 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 19/12/1953 |
Service Life |
57 yrs, 3 mths , 18 dys |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
09/1896 |
To Service |
To service as Lancashire and Yorkshire Railway Number 1329 Built at Horwich Works, Works Number 469 |
|
|
1925 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 10762 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Low Moor (25F) |
|
|
17/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Mirfield (25D) |
|
|
11/09/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Huddersfield Hillhouse (25B) |
|
|
12/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 50762 |
|
|
27/08/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Wakefield (25A) |
|
|
30/06/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Low Moor (25F) |
|
|
06/10/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Mirfield (25D) |
|
|
12/07/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Low Moor (25F) |
|
|
19/12/1953 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 50762 |
|
|