Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 17 Online
» 2687 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 16093 Week
» 69109 Month
» 188636 Year
» 3215489 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Lancashire and Yorkshire Railway |
730 |
|
09/1898 |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway (1923) |
10818 |
|
by 1925 |
British Railways |
50818 |
|
07/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
J. Aspinall |
Class |
1008 |
Company History |
LYR/LMS |
Wheels |
2-4-2T |
Builder |
Horwich Works |
Order Number |
35 |
Works Number |
607 |
To Service |
During 09/1898 |
Withdrawal |
Fri 03/10/1958 |
Service Life |
60 yrs, 1 mth , 2 dys |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
26C |
Bolton |
w/e |
09/09/1950 |
ALLOC |
26A |
Newton Heath |
w/e |
28/04/1951 |
ALLOC |
25F |
Low Moor |
4w/e |
14/06/1952 |
ALLOC |
25E |
Sowerby Bridge |
4w/e |
17/04/1954 |
TOSTORE |
|
|
4w/e |
09/08/1958 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
03/10/1958 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
06/03/1959 |
Over and Wharton branch (Badnall Wharf) |
One track of this short branch from Acton Bridge contains the LTS locos. shown as transferred to Spital Bridge (Peterboro') on 6th March 'condemned' in official lists viz. 41928/39/41/5/6/8/50/77/8/81-7/90-3, also ex LNWR 0-8-0s 48945, 49109/13/17/57/80, 49226/330/68. Another LTS loco, is at Badnall Wharf (between Norton Bridge and Standon Bridge) viz. 41936 along with 41078/156/724, 43419/631, 50646/725/57/77/818/31/55/65, 51424/53, 52399/517, 58066/196. |
SLS/195904 |
02/06/1959 |
Locomotives Sold |
On 2nd June L. & Y. 50818/31/55/65 were removed from Badnall Wharf to Messrs. A. Looms, Spondon, Derby. On 8th June Compounds 41078 an 41156 and Class 3F 43419 an 43631 were removed to Messrs. Steel and Co. Ltd., Coatbridge Iron Works, Whifflet, Lanarks. |
SLS/195907 |
08/08/1959 |
Last few Aspinall 2-4-2T (Albert Looms Yard) |
Only five Aspinall ex-L.Y.R. Class 2P 2-4-2T locomotives now remain in stock; their shed allocations being as follows: 50850 (26C) Bolton, 50721 (27A) Bank Hall, 50746 an 50781 (27C) Southport, and 50795 (55F) Manningham. Mr. G. E. Jones informs us that a visit to Albert Looms Yard near Spondon on 9/8/59 revealed six condemned examples still intact, namely 50646, 50725, 50777, 50818, 50831 an 50855. In addition to these, the remains of another believed to be 50757, were scattered about the yard. All were condemned during October, 1958, with the exception of 50646 which was withdrawn one month later. |
SLS/195910 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
09/1898 |
To Service |
To service as Lancashire and Yorkshire Railway Number 730 Built at Horwich Works, Works Number 607 |
|
|
1925 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 10818 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Newton Heath (26A) |
|
|
07/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 50818 |
|
|
09/09/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bolton (26C) |
|
|
28/04/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Newton Heath (26A) |
|
|
19/05/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Newton Heath (26A) |
|
|
14/06/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Low Moor (25F) |
|
|
24/04/1954 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Sowerby Bridge (25E) |
|
|
03/10/1958 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 50818 |
|
|