Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 9 Online
» 468 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18271 Week
» 71287 Month
» 190814 Year
» 3217667 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Lancashire and Yorkshire Railway |
741 |
|
01/1901 |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway (1923) |
10865 |
|
by 1925 |
British Railways |
50865 |
|
10/1950 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
J. Aspinall |
Class |
1008 |
Company History |
LYR/LMS |
Wheels |
2-4-2T |
Builder |
Horwich Works |
Order Number |
41 |
Works Number |
726 |
To Service |
During 01/1901 |
Withdrawal |
Fri 03/10/1958 |
Service Life |
57 yrs, 9 mths , 2 dys |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
06/03/1959 |
Over and Wharton branch (Badnall Wharf) |
One track of this short branch from Acton Bridge contains the LTS locos. shown as transferred to Spital Bridge (Peterboro') on 6th March 'condemned' in official lists viz. 41928/39/41/5/6/8/50/77/8/81-7/90-3, also ex LNWR 0-8-0s 48945, 49109/13/17/57/80, 49226/330/68. Another LTS loco, is at Badnall Wharf (between Norton Bridge and Standon Bridge) viz. 41936 along with 41078/156/724, 43419/631, 50646/725/57/77/818/31/55/65, 51424/53, 52399/517, 58066/196. |
SLS/195904 |
02/06/1959 |
Locomotives Sold |
On 2nd June L. & Y. 50818/31/55/65 were removed from Badnall Wharf to Messrs. A. Looms, Spondon, Derby. On 8th June Compounds 41078 an 41156 and Class 3F 43419 an 43631 were removed to Messrs. Steel and Co. Ltd., Coatbridge Iron Works, Whifflet, Lanarks. |
SLS/195907 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
01/1901 |
To Service |
To service as Lancashire and Yorkshire Railway Number 741 Built at Horwich Works, Works Number 726 |
|
|
1925 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 10865 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Southport (23C) |
|
|
01/04/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bolton (26C) |
|
|
10/1950 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 50865 |
|
|
12/07/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Low Moor (25F) |
|
|
06/09/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Huddersfield Hillhouse (25B) |
|
|
03/10/1958 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 50865 |
|
|