Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 23 Online
» 3817 Today
» 4916 Yesterday
» 13391 Week
» 78345 Month
» 281009 Year
» 3307862 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Lancashire and Yorkshire Railway |
833 |
|
05/1905 |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway (1923) |
10873 |
|
by 1925 |
British Railways |
50873 |
|
12/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
J. Aspinall |
Class |
1008 |
Company History |
LYR/LMS |
Wheels |
2-4-2T |
Builder |
Horwich Works |
Order Number |
51 |
Works Number |
904 |
To Service |
During 05/1905 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 01/03/1952 |
Service Life |
46 yrs, 10 mths , 0 dys |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
25C |
Goole |
4w/e |
10/11/1945 |
ALLOC |
25A |
Wakefield |
w/e |
27/08/1949 |
ALLOC |
24C |
Lostock Hall |
w/e |
17/03/1951 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
01/03/1952 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
05/1905 |
To Service |
To service as Lancashire and Yorkshire Railway Number 833 Built at Horwich Works, Works Number 904 |
|
|
1925 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 10873 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Mirfield (25D) |
|
|
12/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 50873 |
|
|
27/08/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Wakefield (25A) |
|
|
17/03/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Lostock Hall (24C) |
|
|
24/03/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Lostock Hall (24C) |
|
|
01/03/1952 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 50873 |
|
|