Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 15 Online
» 540 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18343 Week
» 71359 Month
» 190886 Year
» 3217739 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Lancashire and Yorkshire Railway |
1468 |
|
09/1905 |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway (1923) |
10886 |
|
by 1925 |
British Railways |
50886 |
|
22/05/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
J. Aspinall |
Class |
1008 |
Company History |
LYR/LMS |
Wheels |
2-4-2T |
Builder |
Horwich Works |
Order Number |
51 |
Works Number |
918 |
To Service |
During 09/1905 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 29/12/1951 |
Service Life |
46 yrs, 3 mths , 28 dys |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
09/1905 |
To Service |
To service as Lancashire and Yorkshire Railway Number 1468 Built at Horwich Works, Works Number 918 |
|
|
1925 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 10886 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Low Moor (25F) |
|
|
17/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Wigan Central (L&Y) (23D) |
|
|
22/05/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 50886 |
|
|
12/02/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Wakefield (25A) |
|
|
30/06/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Low Moor (25F) |
|
|
17/07/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Low Moor (25F) |
|
|
29/12/1951 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 50886 |
|
|