|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
10/08/1947 | Horwich Works | On 10/8 the following locos. were under repair: 80, 122, 145, 2704, 2747, 2791, 2947, 2970, 5102, 9505, 9542, 9578, 9604, 9645, 9658, 9667, 10429, 10622, 10639, 10648, 10660, 10720, 10743, 10777 (with 10812's bunker), 10892, 10898, 11253, 11319, 11514, 12037, 12047, 12119, 12159, 12171, 12184, 12196, 12363, 12382, 12581, 12598 and 12870. On the same date Nos. 2722, 2729, 2918, 5340 (with a small 3500 gal. tender) 9529, 10640, 10944, 11486 an 12299 were awaiting repair. | SLS/194710 |
31/03/1952 | Locomotives still carrying old numbers (LMS) | Engines running with L.M.S. Numbers. (March 1952) 407, 493, 682, 1324, 1370, 2093, 2994/8, 3062, 3253, 3301/32, 3436, 3514, 3622/62, 3731/49, 3820, 4245, 4436, 6899, 7112/28/29/91, 7377/81, 7407/19/23/96, 7625, 7752, 7822, 8278, 8310, 8510, 8602, 8745, 8921/51, 9010/61, 9108/16/29/99, 9265/70/75/77, 9330/85, 9417, 10725/35, 10807/92, 11537, 12123, 12203/69/93, 16039, 22900/65, 28107/28, 28251, 28312, 28580/3/9. In works: 7597, 4003. Uncertain: 609, 2994 (? done and not advised). | SLS/195206 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
03/1910 | To Service | To service as Lancashire and Yorkshire Railway Number 1535 Built at Horwich Works, Works Number 1081 |
||
1925 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 10892 | ||
1948 | Number Allocated | Allocated number 50892 but not taken up | ||
01/01/1948 | Allocation | Allocation Snapshot - Bury (26D) | ||
17/01/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Bolton (26C) | ||
12/11/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Wakefield (25A) | ||
04/11/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Sowerby Bridge (25E) | ||
24/02/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Wakefield (25A) | ||
28/02/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Wakefield (25A) | ||
09/06/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Sowerby Bridge (25E) | ||
16/06/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Sowerby Bridge (25E) | ||
25/08/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Wakefield (25A) | ||
08/09/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Wakefield (25A) | ||
06/10/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Mirfield (25D) | ||
26/01/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Low Moor (25F) | ||
05/1952 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 10892 |