Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 16 Online
» 3899 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 17305 Week
» 70321 Month
» 189848 Year
» 3216701 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Western Railway |
4243 |
m/e |
02/1916 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
G. Churchward |
Class |
42xx |
Company History |
GWR |
Wheels |
2-8-0T |
Builder |
Swindon Works |
Order Number |
203 |
Works Number |
2633 |
To Service |
During 02/1916 |
Withdrawal |
Thu 14/05/1964 |
Service Life |
48 yrs, 3 mths , 13 dys |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
02/1916 |
To Service |
To service as Great Western Railway Number 4243 Built at Swindon Works, Works Number 2633 |
|
|
15/06/1947 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Aberbeeg (ABEEG) |
|
|
23/04/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Severn Tunnel Junction (STJ) |
|
|
16/05/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Neath (Court Sart) (87A) |
|
|
21/02/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tondu (86F) |
|
|
28/09/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Neath (Court Sart) (87A) |
|
|
30/11/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tondu (88H) |
|
|
04/05/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Pontypool Road (86G) |
|
|
14/05/1964 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 4243 |
|
|
08/1964 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Cashmore's: Newport |
|
|