Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 14 Online
» 979 Today
» 1253 Yesterday
» 8439 Week
» 5952 Month
» 233836 Year
» 1455401 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GWR 4247 m/e 03/1916

Locomotive Specifics
Designer G. Churchward
Class 42xx
Company History GWR
Wheels 2-8-0T
Builder Swindon Works
Order Number 203
Works Number 2637
To Service During 03/1916
Withdrawal During 04/1964
Service Life 48 yrs, 1 mth , 2 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 03/1916
76 Ebbw Junction (Newport) 4w/e 01/12/1945
83E St Blazey 4w/e 27/12/1952
86A Ebbw Junction (Newport) 4w/e 25/01/1958
86F Aberbeeg 4w/e 22/04/1961
88H Tondu 4w/e 14/07/1962
   Withdrawn m/e 04/1964

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 83E St Blazey 4w/e 27/12/1952
ALLOC 86A Ebbw Junction (Newport) 4w/e 28/12/1957
ALLOC 86F Aberbeeg 4w/e 22/04/1961
ALLOC 88H Tondu 4w/e 14/07/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Preservation
Current Status Unknown
Status Date 17/09/2018


Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
09/08/1958 Newport Ebbw MPD - stored locomotives 4247, 6401/9, 9427. SLS/195810

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
03/1916 To Service To service as Great Western Railway Number 4247
Built at Swindon Works, Works Number 2637
   
01/12/1945 Allocation Reallocated to Ebbw Junction (Newport) (76)    
27/12/1952 Allocation Reallocated to St Blazey (83E)    
25/01/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Ebbw Junction (Newport) (86A)    
22/04/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Aberbeeg (86F)    
14/07/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Tondu (88H)    
04/1964 Withdrawn Condemned as 4247    

prev prev