Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 23 Online
» 775 Today
» 1004 Yesterday
» 6380 Week
» 17927 Month
» 417609 Year
» 494196 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GWR 4248   04/1916

Locomotive Specifics
Designer Churchward
Class 42xx
Company History GWR
Wheels 2-8-0T
Builder Swindon Works
To Service During 04/1916
Withdrawal During 05/1963
Service Life 47 yrs , 30 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
87F Llanelly 4w/e 12/08/1961
82B St Philips Marsh 4w/e 02/12/1961
86E Severn Tunnel Junction 4w/e 24/02/1962
   Withdrawn m/e 05/1963

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC STJ Severn Tunnel Junction w/e 02/11/1946
ALLOC NPTG Ebbw Junction (Newport) 4w/e 17/05/1947
ALLOC STJ Severn Tunnel Junction 4w/e 09/08/1947
ALLOC NPTG Ebbw Junction (Newport) 4w/e 29/11/1947
ALLOC 87F Llanelly 4w/e 12/08/1961
ALLOC 82B St Philips Marsh 4w/e 02/12/1961
ALLOC 86E Severn Tunnel Junction 4w/e 24/02/1962
WDN   4w/e 01/06/1963

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also

prev prev