Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 18 Online
» 1186 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18989 Week
» 72005 Month
» 191532 Year
» 3218385 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Western Railway |
4250 |
m/e |
04/1916 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
G. Churchward |
Class |
42xx |
Company History |
GWR |
Wheels |
2-8-0T |
Builder |
Swindon Works |
Order Number |
203 |
Works Number |
2640 |
To Service |
During 04/1916 |
Withdrawal |
Wed 05/09/1962 |
Service Life |
46 yrs, 5 mths , 5 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 09/1963 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
26/03/1961 |
Caerphilly Works (Erecting Shops) |
Erecting Shops: 1424, 1504, 2247, 4250, 4611, 5202/5/16/21/49, 5569, 6340/78, 6764, 6849, 7307, 8795, 9401/90, 9796. Awaiting Works: 3617/93, 4232. Being cut-up: 3778, 7422, 6411. |
SLS/196105 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
04/1916 |
To Service |
To service as Great Western Railway Number 4250 Built at Swindon Works, Works Number 2640 |
|
|
15/06/1947 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Landore (LDR) |
|
|
01/11/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Duffryn Yard (87B) |
|
|
21/02/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cardiff Canton (86C) |
|
|
17/07/1954 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Aberbeeg (86H) |
|
|
22/04/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Duffryn Yard (87B) |
|
|
05/09/1962 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 4250 |
|
|
09/1963 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|