Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 11 Online
» 202 Today
» 866 Yesterday
» 1947 Week
» 10689 Month
» 354868 Year
» 865970 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D426 12/06/1968
TOPS (Tops) 50026 01/01/1973

Names Carried
Name Date From
Indomitable 29/03/1978

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 50
Wheels Co-Co
Builder English Electric Vulcan Foundry
To Service 12/06/1968
Withdrawn 11/12/1990
Withdrawal Reason Power unit
Time in Service 22 yrs, 5 mths , 29 dys
Cut Up 21/04/1994
Status Preserved

Allocations
Code Name Date From
D05 Stoke Division (New) 12/06/1968
LA Laira w/e 11/05/1974
   Withdrawn 11/12/1990

Preservation
Current Status Unknown


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
12/06/1968 To Service To service as D426
Built at English Electric Vulcan Foundry
Allocated to Stoke Division (D05)
   
13/07/1969 Sightings Polmadie Depot visit: On Polmadie shed. RO 10/1969 Link
01/01/1973 Renumbered Renumbered to 50026    
11/05/1974 Allocation Reallocated to Laira (LA)    
29/03/1978 Naming Named 'Indomitable' at Laira    
11/12/1990 Withdrawn Condemned as 50026    

prev prev