Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 15 Online
» 4359 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 17765 Week
» 70781 Month
» 190308 Year
» 3217161 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway (1st) |
13252 |
on |
21/12/1933 |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway (1934) |
2952 |
|
02/03/1936 |
British Railways |
42952 |
|
15/01/1949 |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 07/1965 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
21/12/1933 |
To Service |
To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 13252 Built at Crewe Works, Works Number 120 Allocated to Carlisle Kingmoor (12A) |
|
|
13/07/1935 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Springs Branch (Wigan) (10A) |
|
|
05/10/1935 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Warrington Dallam (8B) |
|
|
02/03/1936 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 2952 |
|
|
17/08/1940 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Llandudno Junction (7A) |
|
|
26/10/1940 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bangor (7B) |
|
|
11/01/1941 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Crewe South (5B) |
|
|
15/01/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 42952 |
|
|
24/11/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stoke (5D) |
|
|
22/06/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Birkenhead Mollington Street (6C) |
|
|
07/09/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Mold Junction (6B) |
|
|
09/11/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Agecroft (9J) |
|
|
23/11/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Aintree (8L) |
|
|
07/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Springs Branch (Wigan) (8F) |
|
|
12/09/1964 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 42952 from Springs Branch (Wigan) (8F) |
|
|
07/1965 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|